|
05/25/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-115
|
|
|
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 87, NAYS 30
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 405461 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (618462)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|