Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023