Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 641 (Ch. 2023-126)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted HB 641
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|