Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0546 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023