|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-250
|
|
|
|
06/16/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/28/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 03/21/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|