Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0558 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 7, 2023