Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|