Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0564 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023