Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/12/23, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed |