Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023