Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1267 (Vetoed by Governor)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 15 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|