Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023