|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-45
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (434686)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/15/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|