Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0614 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023