Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2023-96)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|