Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 8, 2023