|
06/01/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-170
|
|
|
|
05/31/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (166975)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment 166975 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (937544)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Education Pre-K -12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Education Pre-K -12; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|