Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0662 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023