Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 721 (Ch. 2023-149)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 721
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|