Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0670 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023