Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 783 (Ch. 2023-184)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 783
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|