Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0704 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023