05/26/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-135 | |||
05/25/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/16/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed |