Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0708 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023