|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-160
|
|
|
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/21/23, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|