Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0732 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 8, 2023