06/16/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-221 | |||
06/12/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
06/05/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/23 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/23/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Filed |