Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0736 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023