Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/14/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Filed |