Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0844 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023