Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Filed |