Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0870 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 18, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023