Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1405 (Ch. 2023-293)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|