Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0880 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2023