Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 897 (Ch. 2023-212)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 897
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|