Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023