House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (187060)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|