Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0950 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023