Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 931 (Ch. 2023-83)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 931
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|