Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023