Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Filed |