Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023