Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2023-122)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 341
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|