Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0980 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023