Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 443 (Ch. 2023-102), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/12/23, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |