Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0990 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023