|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-136
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 103, NAYS 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (733426)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|