Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023