Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Filed |