Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023